+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (11)
On May 28, 2014 in the Senate:
- Referred to consumer protection
On May 28, 2014 in the Assembly:
- Delivered to senate
- Passed assembly
On February 27, 2014 in the Assembly:
- Advanced to third reading cal.473
On February 26, 2014 in the Assembly:
- Reported
On February 4, 2014 in the Assembly:
- Reported referred to codes
On January 8, 2014 in the Assembly:
- Referred to judiciary
On May 23, 2013 in the Assembly:
- Advanced to third reading cal.424
On May 21, 2013 in the Assembly:
- Reported
On May 7, 2013 in the Assembly:
- Reported referred to codes
On April 12, 2013 in the Assembly:
- Referred to judiciary
+ − Sponsors (11)
Type:
Primary Sponsor