+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (10)
On June 20, 2013 in the Assembly:
- Substituted by s3528a
- Substituted by s3528a
On June 19, 2013 in the Assembly:
- Ordered to third reading rules cal.524
- Rules report cal.524
- Reported
- Reported referred to rules
On June 11, 2013 in the Assembly:
- Reported referred to codes
On June 5, 2013 in the Assembly:
- Print number 6647a
- Amend and recommit to transportation
On April 12, 2013 in the Assembly:
- Referred to transportation
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor