+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (15)
On August 19, 2013 in the Assembly:
- Signed chap.329
- Delivered to governor
On June 21, 2013 in the Senate:
- Returned to assembly
- Passed senate
- 3rd reading cal.863
- Substituted for s4454
On June 19, 2013 in the Senate:
- Referred to rules
On June 19, 2013 in the Assembly:
- Delivered to senate
- Passed assembly
- Home rule request
On June 17, 2013 in the Assembly:
- Ordered to third reading rules cal.335
- Rules report cal.335
- Reported
On June 13, 2013 in the Assembly:
- Reported referred to rules
On April 12, 2013 in the Assembly:
- Referred to ways and means
+ − Vote
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor