+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (14)
On July 2, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Signed Chap.63
- Delivered To Governor
On June 23, 2015 in the Senate:
- Returned To Assembly
- Passed Senate
- Substituted For S4495
On June 17, 2015 in the Senate:
- Referred To Rules
On June 17, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Delivered To Senate
- Passed Assembly
On June 16, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Ordered To Third Reading Rules Cal.499
- Rules Report Cal.499
- Reported
On June 9, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Reported Referred To Rules
On May 28, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Reported Referred To Ways And Means
On March 27, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Referred To Transportation
+ − Vote
June 23, 2015: Floor Vote (Senate)
- Yeas: 61
- Present/NV: 1
- Absent: 1
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor