+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (15)
On April 24, 2018 in the Assembly:
- Reported Referred To Ways And Means
On January 22, 2018 in the Assembly:
- Print Number 6603a
- Amend And Recommit To Governmental Employees
On January 3, 2018 in the Assembly:
- Referred To Governmental Employees
On January 3, 2018 in the Senate:
- Returned To Assembly
- Died In Senate
On June 20, 2017 in the Senate:
- Referred To Rules
On June 20, 2017 in the Assembly:
- Delivered To Senate
- Passed Assembly
On June 19, 2017 in the Assembly:
- Ordered To Third Reading Rules Cal.489
- Rules Report Cal.489
- Reported
- Reported Referred To Rules
On May 23, 2017 in the Assembly:
- Reported Referred To Ways And Means
On March 9, 2017 in the Assembly:
- Referred To Governmental Employees
+ − Sponsors (15)
Type:
Primary Sponsor