+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (18)
On November 23, 2022 in the Assembly:
- Vetoed Memo.47
- Tabled
On November 22, 2022 in the Assembly:
- Delivered To Governor
On June 2, 2022 in the Senate:
- Substituted For S409a
- 3rd Reading Cal.306
- Passed Senate
- Returned To Assembly
On May 16, 2022 in the Assembly:
- Reported
- Rules Report Cal.173
- Ordered To Third Reading Rules Cal.173
- Passed Assembly
- Delivered To Senate
On May 16, 2022 in the Senate:
- Referred To Alcoholism And Substance Abuse
On May 10, 2022 in the Assembly:
- Reported Referred To Rules
On April 21, 2022 in the Assembly:
- Amend And Recommit To Alcoholism And Drug Abuse
- Print Number 658a
On January 5, 2022 in the Assembly:
- Referred To Alcoholism And Drug Abuse
On January 6, 2021 in the Assembly:
- Referred To Alcoholism And Drug Abuse
+ − Vote
June 2, 2022: Floor Vote (Senate)
- Yeas: 63