+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (12)
On November 25, 2019 in the Assembly:
- Signed Chap.543
On November 19, 2019 in the Assembly:
- Delivered To Governor
On June 14, 2019 in the Senate:
- Returned To Assembly
- Passed Senate
- 3rd Reading Cal.1405
- Substituted For S6031
On June 3, 2019 in the Senate:
- Referred To Rules
On June 3, 2019 in the Assembly:
- Delivered To Senate
- Passed Assembly
On May 23, 2019 in the Assembly:
- Advanced To Third Reading Cal.426
On May 21, 2019 in the Assembly:
- Reported
On March 12, 2019 in the Assembly:
- Referred To Children And Families
+ − Vote
June 14, 2019: Floor Vote (Senate)
- Yeas: 61
- Nays: 1