+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (6)
On June 19, 2014 in the Assembly:
- Reported referred to ways and means
On May 20, 2014 in the Assembly:
- Reported referred to codes
On January 8, 2014 in the Assembly:
- Referred to health
On June 5, 2013 in the Assembly:
- Reported referred to ways and means
On June 4, 2013 in the Assembly:
- Reported referred to codes
On April 10, 2013 in the Assembly:
- Referred to health
+ − Sponsors (83)
Type:
Primary Sponsor