+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (19)
On June 19, 2014 in the Assembly:
- Substituted by s6617b
On June 16, 2014 in the Assembly:
- Vote reconsidered - restored to third reading
On June 16, 2014 in the Senate:
- Returned to assembly
On June 16, 2014 in the Assembly:
- Recalled from senate
- Amended on third reading 6558b
On May 5, 2014 in the Senate:
- Referred to environmental conservation
On May 5, 2014 in the Assembly:
- Delivered to senate
- Passed assembly
On April 29, 2014 in the Assembly:
- Amended on third reading 6558a
On January 8, 2014 in the Senate:
- Died in senate
On January 8, 2014 in the Assembly:
- Ordered to third reading cal.306
On January 8, 2014 in the Senate:
- Returned to assembly
On April 23, 2013 in the Senate:
- Referred to environmental conservation
On April 23, 2013 in the Assembly:
- Delivered to senate
- Passed assembly
On April 18, 2013 in the Assembly:
- Advanced to third reading cal.174
On April 16, 2013 in the Assembly:
- Reported
- Reported referred to ways and means
On April 9, 2013 in the Assembly:
- Referred to environmental conservation
+ − Sponsors (37)
Type:
Primary Sponsor