+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (20)
On November 10, 2022 in the Assembly:
- Signed Chap.586
On November 9, 2022 in the Assembly:
- Delivered To Governor
On June 2, 2022 in the Senate:
- Returned To Assembly
- Passed Senate
- 3rd Reading Cal.1887
- Substituted For S2238b
On May 31, 2022 in the Assembly:
- Ordered To Third Reading Rules Cal.453
- Reported
- Rules Report Cal.453
- Passed Assembly
- Delivered To Senate
On May 31, 2022 in the Senate:
- Referred To Health
On May 25, 2022 in the Assembly:
- Reported Referred To Rules
On February 3, 2022 in the Assembly:
- Print Number 6551b
- Amend And Recommit To Ways And Means
On February 1, 2022 in the Assembly:
- Reported Referred To Ways And Means
On January 20, 2022 in the Assembly:
- Print Number 6551a
- Amend (t) And Recommit To Health
On January 5, 2022 in the Assembly:
- Referred To Health
On March 19, 2021 in the Assembly:
- Referred To Health
+ − Vote
June 2, 2022: Floor Vote (Senate)
- Yeas: 63
+ − Sponsors (37)
Type:
Primary Sponsor