+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (7)
On June 3, 2021 in the Assembly:
- Substituted By S3474
On June 2, 2021 in the Assembly:
- Reported
- Rules Report Cal.350
- Ordered To Third Reading Rules Cal.350
On June 1, 2021 in the Assembly:
- Reported Referred To Rules
On May 20, 2021 in the Assembly:
- Reported Referred To Ways And Means
On March 19, 2021 in the Assembly:
- Referred To Health
+ − Sponsors (36)
Type:
Primary Sponsor