+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (11)
On November 20, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Signed Chap.442
On November 10, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Delivered To Governor
On May 18, 2015 in the Senate:
- Returned To Assembly
- Passed Senate
- Substituted For S4518
On April 29, 2015 in the Senate:
- Referred To Crime Victims, Crime And Correction
On April 29, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Delivered To Senate
- Passed Assembly
On April 23, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Advanced To Third Reading Cal.213
On April 22, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Reported
On March 26, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Referred To Correction
+ − Vote
May 18, 2015: Floor Vote (Senate)
- Yeas: 60
- Present/NV: 3
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor