+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (6)
On February 5, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Opinion Referred To Judiciary
On January 13, 2016 in the Assembly:
- To Attorney-general For Opinion
On January 6, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Referred To Governmental Employees
On April 8, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Opinion Referred To Judiciary
On March 26, 2015 in the Assembly:
- To Attorney-general For Opinion
On March 25, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Referred To Governmental Employees