+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (15)
On June 18, 2013 in the Assembly:
- Substituted by s4191b
On June 17, 2013 in the Assembly:
- Rules report cal.329
- Reported
- Ordered to third reading rules cal.329
- Rules report cal.329
- Reported
On June 12, 2013 in the Assembly:
- Reported referred to rules
- Reported referred to rules
On May 31, 2013 in the Assembly:
- Print number 6448b
- Print number 6448b
- Amend and recommit to codes
On May 30, 2013 in the Assembly:
- Print number 6448a
- Amend and recommit to codes
- Reported referred to codes
On April 1, 2013 in the Assembly:
- Referred to insurance