+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (7)
On June 14, 2017 in the Assembly:
- Substituted By S4658
On June 13, 2017 in the Assembly:
- Ordered To Third Reading Rules Cal.222
- Rules Report Cal.222
- Reported
On June 8, 2017 in the Assembly:
- Reported Referred To Rules
On June 6, 2017 in the Assembly:
- Reported Referred To Ways And Means
On March 7, 2017 in the Assembly:
- Referred To Local Governments
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor