+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (8)
On May 28, 2022 in the Assembly:
- Print Number 6399c
- Amend And Recommit To Codes
On January 7, 2022 in the Assembly:
- Print Number 6399b
- Amend And Recommit To Codes
On January 5, 2022 in the Assembly:
- Referred To Codes
On June 7, 2021 in the Assembly:
- Print Number 6399a
- Amend (t) And Recommit To Codes
On March 17, 2021 in the Assembly:
- Referred To Codes
+ − Sponsors (65)
Type:
Primary Sponsor