+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (6)
On March 15, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Reported Referred To Ways And Means
On March 9, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Print Number 6390a
- Amend And Recommit To Aging
On January 6, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Referred To Aging
On April 27, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Reported Referred To Ways And Means
On March 23, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Referred To Aging
+ − Sponsors (29)
Type:
Primary Sponsor