+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (13)
On June 9, 2014 in the Senate:
- Referred to children and families
On June 9, 2014 in the Assembly:
- Delivered to senate
- Passed assembly
- Ordered to third reading rules cal.67
- Rules report cal.67
- Reported
On June 3, 2014 in the Assembly:
- Reported referred to rules
On May 28, 2014 in the Assembly:
- Print number 6337b
- Amend (t) and recommit to children and families
On January 8, 2014 in the Assembly:
- Referred to children and families
On April 23, 2013 in the Assembly:
- Print number 6377a
- Amend (t) and recommit to children and families
On March 26, 2013 in the Assembly:
- Referred to children and families
+ − Sponsors (15)
Type:
Primary Sponsor