+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (14)
On July 5, 2013 in the Assembly:
- Signed chap.98
- Signed chap.98
On July 2, 2013 in the Assembly:
- Delivered to governor
- Delivered to governor
On June 20, 2013 in the Senate:
- Returned to assembly
- Returned to assembly
- Passed senate
- Ordered to third reading cal.1575
On May 23, 2013 in the Assembly:
- Delivered to senate
- Passed assembly
On May 1, 2013 in the Assembly:
- Amended on third reading 6356a
On April 18, 2013 in the Assembly:
- Advanced to third reading cal.165
On April 16, 2013 in the Assembly:
- Reported
On March 25, 2013 in the Assembly:
- Referred to codes
+ − Vote
+ − Sponsors (25)
Type:
Primary Sponsor