+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (8)
On May 9, 2019 in the Assembly:
- Enacting Clause Stricken
On April 24, 2019 in the Assembly:
- Print Number 6336c
- Amend And Recommit To Education
On April 22, 2019 in the Assembly:
- Print Number 6336b
- Amend And Recommit To Education
On April 15, 2019 in the Assembly:
- Print Number 6336a
- Amend (t) And Recommit To Education
On March 6, 2019 in the Assembly:
- Referred To Education
+ − Sponsors (18)
Type:
Primary Sponsor