+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (5)
On May 26, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Advanced To Third Reading Cal.735
On May 24, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Reported
On May 17, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Reported Referred To Codes
On January 6, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Referred To Housing
On January 7, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Referred To Housing