+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (14)
On March 20, 2018 in the Senate:
- Referred To Education
On March 20, 2018 in the Assembly:
- Delivered To Senate
- Passed Assembly
On January 3, 2018 in the Assembly:
- Ordered To Third Reading Cal.445
On January 3, 2018 in the Senate:
- Returned To Assembly
- Died In Senate
On June 6, 2017 in the Senate:
- Referred To Rules
On June 6, 2017 in the Assembly:
- Delivered To Senate
- Passed Assembly
On May 25, 2017 in the Assembly:
- Advanced To Third Reading Cal.535
On May 23, 2017 in the Assembly:
- Reported
On April 24, 2017 in the Assembly:
- Print Number 6281a
- Amend And Recommit To Education
On March 1, 2017 in the Assembly:
- Referred To Education
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor