+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (9)
On June 19, 2013 in the Assembly:
- Substituted by s4170a
- Substituted by s4170a
On June 18, 2013 in the Assembly:
- Ordered to third reading rules cal.429
- Rules report cal.429
- Reported
On June 17, 2013 in the Assembly:
- Reported referred to rules
On May 23, 2013 in the Assembly:
- Print number 6223a
- Amend and recommit to ways and means
On March 18, 2013 in the Assembly:
- Referred to ways and means
+ − Sponsors (54)
Type:
Primary Sponsor