+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (7)
On June 1, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Reported Referred To Codes
On May 20, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Print Number 6214b
- Amend And Recommit To Governmental Operations
On January 6, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Referred To Governmental Operations
On June 12, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Print Number 6214a
- Amend And Recommit To Governmental Operations
On March 17, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Referred To Governmental Operations
+ − Sponsors (24)
Type:
Primary Sponsor