+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (14)
On January 14, 2014 in the Assembly:
- Enacting clause stricken
On January 13, 2014 in the Assembly:
- Committed to election law
On January 8, 2014 in the Assembly:
- Ordered to third reading cal.286
On January 8, 2014 in the Senate:
- Returned to assembly
- Died in senate
On June 3, 2013 in the Senate:
- Referred to elections
On June 3, 2013 in the Assembly:
- Delivered to senate
- Passed assembly
On May 9, 2013 in the Assembly:
- Advanced to third reading cal.330
On May 7, 2013 in the Assembly:
- Reported
On May 1, 2013 in the Assembly:
- Reported referred to ways and means
On April 25, 2013 in the Assembly:
- Print number 6195a
- Amend (t) and recommit to election law
On March 15, 2013 in the Assembly:
- Referred to election law
+ − Sponsors (16)
Type:
Primary Sponsor