+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (15)
On May 17, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Reported Referred To Ways And Means
On January 20, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Committed To Social Services
On January 11, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Amended On Third Reading 6174b
On January 6, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Ordered To Third Reading Cal.235
On January 6, 2016 in the Senate:
- Returned To Assembly
- Died In Senate
On May 13, 2015 in the Senate:
- Referred To Children And Families
On May 12, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Delivered To Senate
- Passed Assembly
On May 7, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Advanced To Third Reading Cal.324
On May 4, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Reported
- Reported Referred To Ways And Means
On April 27, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Print Number 6174a
- Amend And Recommit To Social Services
On March 16, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Referred To Social Services