+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (12)
On June 16, 2014 in the Assembly:
- Ordered to third reading rules cal.255
- Rules report cal.255
- Reported
On June 11, 2014 in the Assembly:
- Reported referred to rules
On June 9, 2014 in the Assembly:
- Reported referred to ways and means
On January 8, 2014 in the Assembly:
- Referred to codes
On June 19, 2013 in the Assembly:
- Ordered to third reading rules cal.519
- Rules report cal.519
- Reported
On June 18, 2013 in the Assembly:
- Reported referred to rules
On June 17, 2013 in the Assembly:
- Reported referred to ways and means
On March 15, 2013 in the Assembly:
- Referred to codes
+ − Sponsors (11)
Type:
Primary Sponsor