+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (6)
On February 18, 2022 in the Assembly:
- Opinion Referred To Judiciary
On January 5, 2022 in the Assembly:
- To Attorney-general For Opinion
- Referred To Election Law
On February 5, 2021 in the Assembly:
- Opinion Referred To Judiciary
On January 15, 2021 in the Assembly:
- To Attorney-general For Opinion
On January 6, 2021 in the Assembly:
- Referred To Election Law
+ − Sponsors (22)
Type:
Primary Sponsor