+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (18)
On October 26, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Signed Chap.380
On October 14, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Delivered To Governor
On June 10, 2015 in the Senate:
- Returned To Assembly
- Passed Senate
- Substituted For S5148a
On June 1, 2015 in the Senate:
- Recommitted To Banks
On June 1, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Returned To Senate
- Repassed Assembly
On May 27, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Recalled From Senate
- Vote Reconsidered - Restored To Third Reading
On May 27, 2015 in the Senate:
- Returned To Assembly
On May 27, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Amended On Third Reading 6105a
On May 6, 2015 in the Senate:
- Referred To Banks
On May 6, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Delivered To Senate
- Passed Assembly
On April 30, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Advanced To Third Reading Cal.269
On April 28, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Reported
On March 16, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Referred To Banks
+ − Vote
June 10, 2015: Floor Vote (Senate)
- Yeas: 61
- Present/NV: 2