+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (14)
On June 8, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Ordered To Third Reading Rules Cal.128
- Rules Report Cal.128
On June 7, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Reported
On June 6, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Reported Referred To Rules
On June 1, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Reported Referred To Codes
On May 6, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Print Number 6099a
- Amend And Recommit To Environmental Conservation
On January 6, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Referred To Environmental Conservation
On June 9, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Ordered To Third Reading Rules Cal.124
- Rules Report Cal.124
- Reported
On June 2, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Reported Referred To Rules
On May 27, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Reported Referred To Codes
On March 16, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Referred To Environmental Conservation
+ − Sponsors (10)
Type:
Primary Sponsor