+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (10)
On February 2, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Starred On Calendar
On January 6, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Ordered To Third Reading Cal.230
On January 6, 2016 in the Senate:
- Returned To Assembly
- Died In Senate
On March 23, 2015 in the Senate:
- Referred To Environmental Conservation
On March 23, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Delivered To Senate
- Passed Assembly
On March 20, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Advanced To Third Reading Cal.129
On March 17, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Reported
On March 11, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Referred To Environmental Conservation
+ − Sponsors (19)
Type:
Primary Sponsor