+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (6)
On May 17, 2022 in the Assembly:
- Reported Referred To Ways And Means
On May 10, 2022 in the Assembly:
- Reported Referred To Codes
On May 6, 2022 in the Assembly:
- Print Number 6071a
- Amend (t) And Recommit To People With Disabilities
On January 5, 2022 in the Assembly:
- Referred To People With Disabilities
On March 8, 2021 in the Assembly:
- Referred To People With Disabilities