+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (9)
On June 17, 2016 in the Senate:
- Referred To Rules
On June 17, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Delivered To Senate
- Passed Assembly
On May 19, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Advanced To Third Reading Cal.668
On May 17, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Reported
On May 6, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Print Number 6054a
- Amend And Recommit To Housing
On January 6, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Referred To Housing
On March 11, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Referred To Housing
+ − Sponsors (23)
Type:
Primary Sponsor