+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (9)
On June 20, 2017 in the Assembly:
- Substituted By S3867a
On June 19, 2017 in the Assembly:
- Ordered To Third Reading Rules Cal.484
- Rules Report Cal.484
- Reported
- Reported Referred To Rules
On May 15, 2017 in the Assembly:
- Print Number 6044a
- Amend (t) And Recommit To Ways And Means
On April 25, 2017 in the Assembly:
- Reported Referred To Ways And Means
On February 21, 2017 in the Assembly:
- Referred To Health