+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (6)
On January 13, 2020 in the Assembly:
- Amended On Third Reading 6023b
On January 9, 2020 in the Assembly:
- Amended On Third Reading 6023a
On January 8, 2020 in the Assembly:
- Ordered To Third Reading Cal.227
On May 2, 2019 in the Assembly:
- Advanced To Third Reading Cal.254
On April 30, 2019 in the Assembly:
- Reported
On February 26, 2019 in the Assembly:
- Referred To Health
+ − Sponsors (9)
Type:
Primary Sponsor