+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (13)
On July 24, 2017 in the Assembly:
- Signed Chap.94
On July 12, 2017 in the Assembly:
- Delivered To Governor
On June 13, 2017 in the Senate:
- Returned To Assembly
- Passed Senate
- 3rd Reading Cal.1327
- Substituted For S3692
On June 6, 2017 in the Senate:
- Referred To Rules
On June 6, 2017 in the Assembly:
- Delivered To Senate
- Passed Assembly
- Home Rule Request
On May 25, 2017 in the Assembly:
- Advanced To Third Reading Cal.531
On May 23, 2017 in the Assembly:
- Reported
On February 21, 2017 in the Assembly:
- Referred To Governmental Employees
+ − Vote
June 13, 2017: Floor Vote (Senate)
- Yeas: 63
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor