+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (17)
On July 16, 2021 in the Assembly:
- Signed Chap.248
On July 12, 2021 in the Assembly:
- Delivered To Governor
On June 9, 2021 in the Senate:
- Returned To Assembly
- Passed Senate
- 3rd Reading Cal.1705
- Substituted For S6957
On June 7, 2021 in the Assembly:
- Reported
- Rules Report Cal.444
- Passed Assembly
- Ordered To Third Reading Rules Cal.444
- Delivered To Senate
On June 7, 2021 in the Senate:
- Referred To Rules
On June 3, 2021 in the Assembly:
- Reported Referred To Rules
On May 25, 2021 in the Assembly:
- Reported Referred To Ways And Means
On May 19, 2021 in the Assembly:
- Print Number 5979a
- Amend (t) And Recommit To Health
On March 4, 2021 in the Assembly:
- Referred To Health
+ − Vote
June 9, 2021: Floor Vote (Senate)
- Yeas: 63