+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (15)
On February 25, 2020 in the Assembly:
- Amended On Third Reading (t) 5976b
On January 21, 2020 in the Assembly:
- Amended On Third Reading (t) 5976a
On January 8, 2020 in the Assembly:
- Ordered To Third Reading Cal.225
On January 8, 2020 in the Senate:
- Returned To Assembly
- Died In Senate
On February 27, 2019 in the Senate:
- Referred To Investigations And Government Operations
On February 27, 2019 in the Assembly:
- Delivered To Senate
- Passed Assembly
- Ordered To Third Reading Rules Cal.33
- Rules Report Cal.33
- Reported
- Reported Referred To Rules
- Reported Referred To Ways And Means
- Reported Referred To Codes
On February 22, 2019 in the Assembly:
- Referred To Governmental Operations
+ − Sponsors (35)
Type:
Primary Sponsor