+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (11)
On July 23, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Signed Chap.83
On July 14, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Delivered To Governor
On May 28, 2015 in the Senate:
- Returned To Assembly
- Passed Senate
- Substituted For S4225
On April 29, 2015 in the Senate:
- Referred To Education
On April 29, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Delivered To Senate
- Passed Assembly
On April 23, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Advanced To Third Reading Cal.208
On April 21, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Reported
On March 9, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Referred To Education
+ − Vote
May 28, 2015: Floor Vote (Senate)
- Yeas: 58
- Present/NV: 5
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor