+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (6)
On June 2, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Reported Referred To Ways And Means
On January 6, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Referred To Social Services
On May 4, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Reported Referred To Ways And Means
On March 25, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Print Number 5936a
- Amend And Recommit To Social Services
On March 9, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Referred To Social Services
+ − Sponsors (17)
Type:
Primary Sponsor