+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (17)
On January 13, 2020 in the Senate:
- Referred To Alcoholism And Substance Abuse
On January 13, 2020 in the Assembly:
- Delivered To Senate
- Passed Assembly
On January 8, 2020 in the Assembly:
- Ordered To Third Reading Cal.28
On January 8, 2020 in the Senate:
- Returned To Assembly
- Died In Senate
On June 20, 2019 in the Assembly:
- Passed Assembly
- Delivered To Senate
On June 20, 2019 in the Senate:
- Referred To Rules
On June 19, 2019 in the Assembly:
- Ordered To Third Reading Rules Cal.618
- Rules Report Cal.618
- Reported
- Reported Referred To Rules
On June 5, 2019 in the Assembly:
- Print Number 590a
- Amend And Recommit To Ways And Means
On January 23, 2019 in the Assembly:
- Reported Referred To Ways And Means
On January 9, 2019 in the Assembly:
- Referred To Alcoholism And Drug Abuse