+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (20)
On January 17, 2024 in the Assembly:
- Print Number 5898c
- Amend And Recommit To Real Property Taxation
On January 12, 2024 in the Assembly:
- Reference Changed To Real Property Taxation
On January 3, 2024 in the Assembly:
- Referred To Ways And Means
On January 3, 2024 in the Senate:
- Returned To Assembly
- Died In Senate
On June 10, 2023 in the Assembly:
- Reported
- Rules Report Cal.852
- Ordered To Third Reading Rules Cal.852
- Home Rule Request
- Passed Assembly
- Delivered To Senate
On June 10, 2023 in the Senate:
- Referred To Rules
On June 9, 2023 in the Assembly:
- Reported Referred To Rules
On June 8, 2023 in the Assembly:
- Reference Changed To Ways And Means
On June 6, 2023 in the Assembly:
- Print Number 5898b
- Amend And Recommit To Real Property Taxation
On June 5, 2023 in the Assembly:
- Print Number 5898a
- Amend And Recommit To Real Property Taxation
On March 24, 2023 in the Assembly:
- Referred To Real Property Taxation
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor