+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (18)
On September 29, 2023 in the Assembly:
- Signed Chap.510
On September 19, 2023 in the Assembly:
- Delivered To Governor
On June 5, 2023 in the Senate:
- Returned To Assembly
- Passed Senate
- 3rd Reading Cal.1369
- Substituted For S4564b
On May 31, 2023 in the Senate:
- Referred To Rules
On May 31, 2023 in the Assembly:
- Delivered To Senate
- Passed Assembly
On May 30, 2023 in the Assembly:
- Reported
- Ordered To Third Reading Rules Cal.370
- Rules Report Cal.370
On May 24, 2023 in the Assembly:
- Amend And Recommit To Rules 5897b
- Reported Referred To Rules
- Reported Referred To Ways And Means
On May 16, 2023 in the Assembly:
- Print Number 5897a
- Amend And Recommit To Transportation
On March 24, 2023 in the Assembly:
- Referred To Transportation
+ − Vote
June 5, 2023: Floor Vote (Senate)
- Yeas: 60
- Nays: 1
- Present/NV: 2
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor