+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (16)
On May 1, 2018 in the Senate:
- Referred To Codes
On May 1, 2018 in the Assembly:
- Delivered To Senate
- Passed Assembly
On January 3, 2018 in the Assembly:
- Ordered To Third Reading Cal.420
On January 3, 2018 in the Senate:
- Returned To Assembly
- Died In Senate
On June 7, 2017 in the Senate:
- Referred To Rules
On June 7, 2017 in the Assembly:
- Delivered To Senate
- Passed Assembly
- Ordered To Third Reading Rules Cal.113
- Rules Report Cal.113
- Reported
On June 6, 2017 in the Assembly:
- Reported Referred To Rules
On June 2, 2017 in the Assembly:
- Print Number 5885a
- Amend (t) And Recommit To Codes
On February 16, 2017 in the Assembly:
- Referred To Codes
+ − Sponsors (52)
Type:
Primary Sponsor