+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (5)
On June 14, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Reported Referred To Rules
On May 10, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Reported Referred To Ways And Means
On January 6, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Referred To Consumer Affairs And Protection
On May 27, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Reported Referred To Ways And Means
On March 5, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Referred To Consumer Affairs And Protection
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor