+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (6)
On February 26, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Advanced To Third Reading Cal.397
On February 25, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Reported
On January 6, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Referred To Energy
On March 27, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Advanced To Third Reading Cal.155
On March 24, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Reported
On March 5, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Referred To Energy
+ − Sponsors (21)
Type:
Primary Sponsor