+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (6)
On January 22, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Advanced To Third Reading Cal.343
On January 21, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Reported
On January 6, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Referred To Health
On March 27, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Advanced To Third Reading Cal.154
On March 24, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Reported
On March 5, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Referred To Health
+ − Sponsors (12)
Type:
Primary Sponsor