+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (7)
On January 22, 2019 in the Assembly:
- Substituted By S659a
On January 17, 2019 in the Assembly:
- Advanced To Third Reading Cal.8
On January 15, 2019 in the Assembly:
- Reported
On January 14, 2019 in the Assembly:
- Reported Referred To Codes
On January 11, 2019 in the Assembly:
- Print Number 585a
- Amend (t) And Recommit To Insurance
On January 9, 2019 in the Assembly:
- Referred To Insurance
+ − Sponsors (57)
Type:
Primary Sponsor