+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (5)
On January 3, 2018 in the Assembly:
- Ordered To Third Reading Cal.418
On May 18, 2017 in the Assembly:
- Advanced To Third Reading Cal.433
On May 16, 2017 in the Assembly:
- Reported
On April 26, 2017 in the Assembly:
- Reported Referred To Ways And Means
On February 16, 2017 in the Assembly:
- Referred To Children And Families
+ − Sponsors (10)
Type:
Primary Sponsor