+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (12)
On March 20, 2014 in the Senate:
- Referred to energy and telecommunications
On March 20, 2014 in the Assembly:
- Delivered to senate
- Passed assembly
On January 8, 2014 in the Assembly:
- Ordered to third reading cal.272
On January 8, 2014 in the Senate:
- Returned to assembly
- Died in senate
On June 11, 2013 in the Senate:
- Referred to energy and telecommunications
On June 11, 2013 in the Assembly:
- Delivered to senate
- Passed assembly
On April 25, 2013 in the Assembly:
- Advanced to third reading cal.223
On April 22, 2013 in the Assembly:
- Reported
On March 6, 2013 in the Assembly:
- Referred to energy